ONSIDE YOUTH ZONES

Charity number: 1125893
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN CHARLES ROBERTS Trustee 08 December 2015
THE HOLROYD FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Anabel Kate Hoult Trustee 27 April 2020 None on record
Wendy Karen Cecilia GRIFFITHS Trustee 12 May 2009 None on record
Nicholas David Mark Sleep Trustee 20 February 2018
THE ONSIDE FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
CROYDON YOUTH ZONE Charity reporting is up to date
CHARLES STUART MINDENHALL Trustee 07 September 2015
BARKING & DAGENHAM YOUTH ZONE Charity reporting is up to date
MENTAL HEALTH INNOVATIONS Charity reporting is up to date
THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF CAMBRIDGE Charity reporting is up to date
THE CHALCOT FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Anne-Marie Headley Trustee 19 August 2020 None on record
BILL HOLROYD Chair 13 May 2008
THE ONSIDE FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
THE HOLROYD FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Janaki Kamala Allen Trustee 19 August 2020 None on record
Michael Thomas Jackson Trustee 27 April 2020 None on record
JOHN RODERICK MARSH Trustee 06 July 2012 None on record