Accounts and annual returns THE KATHLEEN MARY LUMB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1125172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 June 2022 08 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 June 2021 01 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2021 01 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 June 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 June 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 June 2018 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 June 2018 Not Required