Financial history THE KATHLEEN MARY LUMB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1125172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/06/2018 05/06/2019 05/06/2020 05/06/2021 05/06/2022
Total gross income £10.92k £10.93k £9.01k £40.05k £4.88k
Total expenditure £12.35k £11.04k £10.96k £47.64k £5.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A