BHAI LALO GURMAT PARCHAR SOCIETY

Charity number: 1125985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 February 2018 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1549 days