THE BRADFORD COURT CHAPLAINCY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to promote the mental and spiritual wellbeing of all court users, regardless of their gender, sexual orientation, religious beliefs and/or race by the provision of advice, counselling and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 27 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Turnpenny | Chair | 02 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Benedetto Paolozzi | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yunus Mussa Mayat | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mariam Deen | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Susan Milnes | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Victoria Reynolds | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Eakin JP | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MANOJ KUMAN N L JOSHI | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Revd Canon Denise Poole | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|||||
DILSHAD KHAN JP | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARY MARGARET CARROLL JP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.91k | £47.59k | £62.24k | £67.74k | £76.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.32k | £33.98k | £51.03k | £62.58k | £66.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.72k | £16.83k | £1.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED 14 AUGUST 2008.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELLBEING OF ALL COURT USERS AS DEFINED IN CLAUSE 3 (A)(I), REGARDLESS OF THEIR GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND/OR RACE BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT. B) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (I) THE TERM "COURT USERS" SHALL MEAN PERSONS EITHER ATTENDING OR WHO ARE EXPECTING TO ATTEND BRADFORD MAGISTRATES COURT OR ANY OTHER COURT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR THOSE ACCUSED OF COMMITTING OFFENCES TOGETHER WITH THEIR SPOUSES, PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS, WITNESSES OF CRIME AS REFERRED BY WITNESS SUPPORT, MAGISTRATES, HER MAJESTY'S COURTS SERVICE STAFF, PROBATION SERVICE STAFF, CROWN PROSECUTION SERVICE STAFF, DEFENCE SOLICITORS, COURT INTERPRETERS, THOSE ATTENDING THE CORONER'S COURT AND ANY MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC ATTENDING COURT OUT OF GENERAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o BRADFORD MAGISTRATES COURT
THE TYRLS
BRADFORD
WEST YORKSHIRE
BD1 1LA
- Phone:
- 01274722422
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window