WOLVERHAMPTON WANDERERS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 19 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 14 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 14 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 13 June 2019 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 13 June 2019 74 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 21 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 21 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 01 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 01 March 2017 On time Download