WOLVERHAMPTON WANDERERS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £1.02m £1.00m £892.45k £1.23m £1.57m
Total expenditure £1.16m £1.03m £916.90k £998.87k £1.13m
Income from government contracts £20.00k £0 £55.00k £55.00k £55.00k
Income from government grants £20.00k £20.00k N/A £16.67k £33.30k
Income - Donations and legacies £259.30k £179.42k £111.16k £77.09k £169.15k
Income - Other trading activities £180.12k £166.30k £199.96k £318.45k £249.62k
Income - Charitable activities £580.13k £658.45k £581.34k £835.37k £1.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £826 £270 £410 £477 £8.84k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.14m £1.01m £894.23k £961.59k £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.29k £20.88k £22.68k £37.28k £63.92k
Expenditure - Governance £5.70k £172.72k £233.97k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £126.57k £86.80k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0