Accounts and annual returns COLCHESTER KORBAN PROJECT

Charity number: 1125617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 August 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 16 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 24 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 02 February 2017 On time