Financial history SAFAR ACADEMY TRUST

Charity number: 1125653
Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £766.86k £765.35k £714.44k £611.49k £1.18m
Total expenditure £598.92k £693.99k £736.98k £645.39k £1.23m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £87.76k £55.36k £2.88k
Income - Donations and legacies £233.36k £161.99k £320.89k £212.03k £57.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £724.70k
Income - Charitable activities £252.70k £243.67k £305.80k £344.11k £396.94k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £280.80k £259.69k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £87.76k £55.36k £2.88k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £486.79k £532.37k £608.74k £561.48k £837.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £324.98k
Expenditure - Governance £1.27k £0 £1.30k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £112.13k £161.63k £128.23k £83.92k £70.71k