Financial history THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION SWINDON BRANCH

Charity number: 1125552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £285 £50 £250 £325 £0
Total expenditure £1.39k £200 £200 £205 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A