THE JUNCTION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £553.04k £712.80k £854.78k £1.29m £1.21m
Total expenditure £527.81k £597.41k £848.74k £1.22m £1.11m
Income from government contracts £250.11k £480.97k £468.62k £765.89k £412.64k
Income from government grants £83.56k £51.50k £292.97k £298.16k £529.64k
Income - Donations and legacies £12.56k £23.33k £14.07k £43.39k £18.25k
Income - Other trading activities £13.57k £22.19k £60.58k £98.20k £129.41k
Income - Charitable activities £526.79k £667.28k £780.13k £1.15m £1.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £104 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £527.81k £597.41k £848.74k £1.22m £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.33k £7.16k £9.45k £9.13k £9.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0