THE JUNCTION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shaun Hogg Trustee 01 June 2016 None on record
Matthew Knibbs Trustee 17 May 2021 None on record
Dr Helen Oatway Trustee 03 February 2014 None on record
Joanne Sarah Booth Trustee 13 March 2020 None on record
Christopher Mark Adams Chair 10 September 2014 None on record