CHERRY AIDE

Charity number: 1125224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 May 2020 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 November 2016 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required