Financial history A.P.A.G.B.I. LIMITED

Charity number: 1128113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £225.10k £211.55k £200.88k £86.08k £111.18k
Total expenditure £229.79k £230.77k £217.06k £74.68k £90.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A