Trustees A.P.A.G.B.I. LIMITED
Charity number: 1128113

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mark Thomas | Chair | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laurence Hulatt | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nirmala Soundararajan | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raju Reddy | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kira Chandra Achaibar | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sumit Kisore Das | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet MAry Stansfield | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Marina Scholefield | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Courtman | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher David Gildersleve | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.