BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATON & COMMUNITY CENTRE BOLTON

Charity number: 1125754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 February 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 February 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 February 2019 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 February 2018 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 February 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required