ADVOCACY AFTER FATAL DOMESTIC ABUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Including: Listen to families who have suffered fatal domestic abuse Advocate with and for families. Inform, guide, support, enable. Specialist help with inquiries including homicide reviews. Educate the community by disseminating information and speaking out Train police and other agencies to improve services and interact with victims constructively Help develop quality of homicide reviews
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Total income includes £285,956 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- AAFDA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.87k | £229.41k | £366.52k | £342.70k | £451.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £219.33k | £231.76k | £353.99k | £356.42k | £453.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £80.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.00k | £5.00k | £139.00k | £100.00k | £285.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT, TRAUMA OR LOSS, WHETHER ARISING FROM DOMESTIC ABUSE OR OTHERWISE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT, BEFRIENDING AND ADVOCACY. TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE LIFE BY: (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC IN ISSUES RELATING TO DOMESTIC ABUSE INCLUDING ITS NATURE, IMPACT, CAUSES, REMEDIES AND PREVENTION AND (B) ADVISING AND ASSISTING PERSONS IN CONNECTION WITH THE HOMICIDE REVIEWS AND INQUIRIES INTO VIOLENT AND UNEXPECTED FATALITIES AND SERIOUS INJURIES AND OTHER ABUSE. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window