IN CONTROL PARTNERSHIPS

Charity number: 1130761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 May 2018 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 May 2018 110 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 January 2017 On time Download