AMAZON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 04 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 10 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 10 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 28 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 28 April 2017 On time Download