THE BURNGREAVE MESSENGER LIMITED

Charity number: 1130836
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 March 2021 46 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 April 2018 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 April 2018 86 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 January 2017 On time Download