THE BURNGREAVE MESSENGER LIMITED

Charity number: 1130836
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £52.21k £114.76k £127.84k £100.80k £36.10k
Total expenditure £35.73k £105.14k £114.16k £121.60k £64.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £1.60k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £932 £0 N/A N/A