Financial history MAPACTION

Charity number: 1126727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.10m £910.16k £1.16m £1.18m £1.65m
Total expenditure £1.14m £1.00m £1.19m £1.12m £1.52m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £34.15k N/A
Income from government grants £326.79k £173.43k £205.00k £86.57k £160.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £554.65k £147.53k £222.02k £147.22k £346.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £5.80k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £526.98k £756.64k £909.52k £1.02m £1.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £186 £2.97k £3.75k £17
Income - Other £15.53k £0 £25.03k £16.82k £4.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.07m £890.38k £1.05m £969.61k £1.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £75.17k £111.53k £136.46k £147.26k £165.78k
Expenditure - Governance £7.39k £0 £8.68k £7.45k £7.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £356.86k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0