Trustees MAPACTION
Charity number: 1126727

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Moody | Chair | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Powys Broke Carver | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Ian Jarvis | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Evans | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ronald Ewing | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gaye Anne Yvonne Hudson | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hosham Ali Khogali Ismail | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven James Harper | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Flemming Nielsen | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Beaumont | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Frankland | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.