Accounts and annual returns KIDZ KLUB BRIGHTON & HOVE

Charity number: 1126869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 September 2020 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 28 September 2020 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 09 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window