Financial history KIDZ KLUB BRIGHTON & HOVE

Charity number: 1126869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £124.92k £124.89k £151.47k £116.91k £129.73k
Total expenditure £115.08k £122.01k £134.40k £99.70k £131.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A