THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (RCCG) CITY OF PRAISE

Charity number: 1127435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 09 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 16 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 16 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 16 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 23 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 27 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 27 March 2017 On time Download