Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S APPROVED PREMISES

Charity number: 1129748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window