SOCIAL TECH TRUST

Charity number: 1125735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 06 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 06 October 2016 On time Download