SOCIAL TECH TRUST

Charity number: 1125735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.06m £5.70m £84.08k £459.42k £99.00k
Total expenditure £3.64m £4.35m £1.45m £1.64m £775.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £300.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.00m £5.63m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £61.91k £64.57k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.64m £4.35m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £15.85k £12.97k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.63m £3.06m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A