SOCIAL TECH TRUST

Charity number: 1125735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Russell Ian Johnstone Trustee 15 December 2020
SOCIAL MOBILITY BUSINESS PARTNERSHIP Received: On time
Sunil Suri Trustee 15 December 2020 None on record
Robert Tashima Trustee 15 December 2020 None on record
Nicholas Wise Trustee 15 December 2020 None on record
Bill Liao Chair 14 April 2014 None on record
Maria Aleksandra Slowinska Nelson Trustee 24 June 2021 None on record
Hannah Jane Keartland Trustee 03 July 2017 None on record
Nicolas Mark Alexander Temple Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
Anisah Osman Britton Trustee 15 December 2020 None on record