FRIENDS OF STONESFIELD SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1126071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising for Stonesfield Primary School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 04 September 2023

Total income: £7,886
Total expenditure: £4,058

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 September 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STONESFIELD PTA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Hopkinson Chair 15 December 2022
None on record
Sarah Lydiat Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Christopher Edward Skerrett Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Robyn Venables Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Hannah Crowe Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/09/2019 04/09/2020 04/09/2021 04/09/2022 04/09/2023
Total gross income £7.12k £3.33k £8.09k £5.87k £7.89k
Total expenditure £4.28k £4.65k £5.24k £2.46k £4.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 September 2023 16 January 2025 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2022 11 July 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2021 25 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2020 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 September 2019 23 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Stonesfield Primary School
High Street
Stonesfield
WITNEY
OX29 8PU
Phone:
07854686426