HAMPTON SINGERS

Charity number: 1125703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 October 2020 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 September 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required