HAMPTON SINGERS

Charity number: 1125703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £9.70k £12.40k £12.38k £6.41k £7.82k
Total expenditure £8.54k £12.04k £12.27k £7.36k £7.82k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A