Financial history ST NICHOLAS WORLD DEVELOPMENT GROUP

Charity number: 1125836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £81.16k £47.96k £61.60k £58.84k £68.80k
Total expenditure £59.92k £58.83k £57.77k £45.96k £52.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A