CHARVILLE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1125902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 July 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 September 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required