Trustees MILTON KEYNES YMCA LIMITED
Charity number: 1125743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Walker | Chair | 20 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Philip Stainsby | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benedicta Morrow | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Swift | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Margaret Keen | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Vasco Fernandes | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Julia Anne Upton MBE | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANTHONY JAMES HOLDEN | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|||||
PRESTON THOMAS AYRES FCA | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.