HEALTHCARE QUALITY IMPROVEMENT PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1127049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Samir Bloomfield Trustee 18 November 2021 None on record
Dr Victoria Tzortziou Brown Trustee 11 March 2015
TURNING POINT Received: On time
Janice Anne Gabriel Trustee 18 November 2021 None on record
Susan Masters Trustee 14 November 2019 None on record
Miles Sibley Trustee 14 November 2019 None on record
Gillian Edwina Coverdale Trustee 18 November 2021 None on record
SARAH DUNNETT Trustee 23 July 2015 None on record
PHILIP GRIMSHAW BAKER Trustee 30 October 2013 None on record
Caroline Jan MacEwen Dr Trustee 17 November 2020
MOORFIELDS EYE CHARITY Received: On time
ALASTAIR HENDERSON Trustee 30 October 2013
FACULTY OF MEDICAL LEADERSHIP AND MANAGEMENT Received: On time