BELIEVERS FELLOWSHIP AND PRAYER MINISTRY

Charity number: 1126684
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 September 2016 On time Download