HOLDBROOK CHRISTIAN CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1126197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 23 June 2020 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 02 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 20 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required