CLYTHA GROUP RDA LIMITED

Charity number: 1126592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE SOUTH EAST WALES AREA

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,742
Total expenditure: £11,650

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Monmouthshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Penelope Joanne Tooze Chair 13 November 2018
None on record
Angela McGregor Trustee 19 October 2023
None on record
Angela Muriel Gould Trustee 04 August 2021
None on record
Alison Pinkerton Spencer Trustee 22 June 2021
None on record
Bettina Belinda Boxhall-James Trustee 22 June 2021
None on record
Dr Julie Alexander Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Alison Mary Morgan Trustee 19 February 2019
None on record
Jennifer Mary Richards Trustee 16 September 2014
None on record
RACHEL GILLIAN WOLVERSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.56k £245 £276 £3.49k £9.74k
Total expenditure £8.63k £731 £1.10k £1.70k £11.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 September 2022 222 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Woodspring
Trostrey
USK
USK
NP16 6AR
Phone:
07825342659
Website:

No information available