THE COVENTRY MUSLIM SWAHILI ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1126750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 January 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 January 2020 86 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 February 2019 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 February 2019 116 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 June 2017 On time Download