THE COVENTRY MUSLIM SWAHILI ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1126750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £133.27k £242.79k £89.49k £93.74k £54.32k
Total expenditure £30.33k £39.92k £45.90k £20.70k £23.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A