THE CIVIC MEDIA PLATFORM LTD

Charity number: 1127432
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 September 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 September 2021 71 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 September 2020 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required