THE CIVIC MEDIA PLATFORM LTD

Charity number: 1127432
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £20 £20 £16 £18 £226.99k
Total expenditure £53 £53 £17.57k £17.76k £183.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A