A CHILD'S TRUST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125991
Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 157 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 157 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 December 2020 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 January 2020 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 31 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required