A CHILD'S TRUST FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1125991
Charity reporting is overdue by 159 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £3.21k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.32k £4.16k £2.29k £720 £1.32k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A