Accounts and annual returns ZAWIA NAQSHBANDIA MUJADDADIA TRUST

Charity number: 1127520
Charity reporting is overdue by 242 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 242 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 242 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2022 424 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 March 2022 424 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 December 2020 333 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 December 2020 333 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 May 2019 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 May 2019 104 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required