ZAWIA NAQSHBANDIA MUJADDADIA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the Charity during the financial year has been: Assisting with operation of Public library in Bathroi, dadyal. The charity is currently developing more comprehensive plans to further its work both at home and abroad. Support to victims of Pakistan Floods. Raise funds to purchase a building for the charity, which will also be made available to the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £35,237 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rotherham
- Morocco
- Pakistan
Governance
- 14 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muqim Zulnun Mahruf Rashid | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED JAMIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £2.54k | £112.77k | £171.78k | £38.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.38k | £2.54k | £33.28k | £6.86k | £22.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £35.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 424 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 424 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 20 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2 TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE QURAN AND THE HADITHS OF THE HOLY PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE BY UPON HIM) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCHOOL OF IMAM ABU ANIFA. 3 THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY A EDUCATING THE PUBLIC BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE DISTINCTIVE FEATURES OF ISLAM B PROMOTING GOOD RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS C PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS 4 TO RELIEVE MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY, WHETHER OR NOT RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A CLIFTON LANE
ROTHERHAM
S65 2AA
- Phone:
- 07792744490
- Email:
- abcforum.mahroof@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window