WATCHTREE NATURE RESERVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1127029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £159.07k £116.50k £218.82k £170.92k £294.90k
Total expenditure £95.44k £105.24k £163.75k £197.17k £248.84k
Income from government contracts £100.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £9.92k N/A N/A