Governance Connected Voice
Charity number: 1125877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 15 September 2008: Standard registration
- 26 March 2012: Funds received from 226263 NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
- 24 April 2012: Funds received from 226263-1 ROSE JOICEY FUND
- 17 September 2018: Funds received from 1148472 HAREF
- 01 May 2019: Funds received from 1143144 NORTHERN NEUROLOGICAL ALLIANCE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.